House
|
04/26/2023
|
Approved by Governor 04/26/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Finance
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Authored by Senator Kidd (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Cantrell
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Lepak
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Remove Representative Lepak as principal House author and substitute with Representative Lawson
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Lepak
|
|
|