Senate | 04/02/2024 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 19 | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lepak, McBride, Williams | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative ODonnell |