Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Conference granted, SCs named Murdock, Pugh, Seifried, Daniels, Green, Hicks
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 19
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Steagall
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 29
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Moore, West (Tammy), Fugate, Provenzano
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative McBride, Baker
|
|
|