House | 02/27/2023 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Remove Representative Humphrey as principal House author and substitute with Representative Cantrell | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Humphrey | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | First Reading |