Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2672 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 21, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2024

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 29, 2024