Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Deck | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Schreiber | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron, Dollens | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Hefner, McBride |