Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 19 | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Authored by Senator Alvord (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Duel |