Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 16 | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Duel |