Senate | 04/13/2023 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 7 | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Authored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Public Safety | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Remove Representative Miller as principal House author and substitute with Representative May | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Miller |