Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2776 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 18, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 16, 2024

Amended

Bill April 3, 2024
Bill February 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 26, 2024