Senate | 04/11/2023 | Reported Do Pass Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Authored by Senator Thompson (Kristen) (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Stinson |