House
|
04/26/2023
|
Becomes law without Governor's signature 04/26/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Administrative Rules committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Kendrix
|
|
|