Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Failed in Committee - Retirement and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Woods
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Coleman
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Provenzano
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Pemberton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Alonso-Sandoval
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 34
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Returned to General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Deck, Hefner
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Martinez
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 46
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Wallace
|
|
|