Senate | 04/10/2023 | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Reported Do Pass Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife Committee then to Finance Committee | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Sims | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 8 | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Wallace |