House
|
05/22/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/22/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Rejection of SA's and request for conference rescinded
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Paxton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Wallace
|
|
|