House | 05/23/2024 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Rosino | ||
House | 05/23/2024 | Remove Senator Thompson (Roger) as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Hall | ||
House | 05/23/2024 | Remove as coauthor Senator(s) Hall | ||
House | 05/13/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Caldwell (Trey) | ||
House | 05/13/2024 | Remove as author Representative(s) Martinez | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Hall | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Wallace, Martinez | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | First Reading |