Oklahoma 2024 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2928 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/30/2024

                    An Act 
ENROLLED HOUSE 
BILL NO. 2928 	By: Wallace and Caldwell (Trey ) 
of the House 
 
   and 
 
  Hall and Rosino of the 
Senate 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to the Oklahoma Department of 
Commerce; requiring that portions of certain funds be 
utilized for certain purpo ses; providing budgeting 
and expenditure limitations and procedures; providing 
for lapse of funds under certain conditions; 
providing an effective date; and declaring an 
emergency. 
 
 
 
 
SUBJECT: Oklahoma Department of Commerce 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
 
SECTION 1.  From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma 
Department of Commerce in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1125 of the 2nd 
Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of T wo Hundred 
Twenty-nine Thousand Nine Hundred Forty-five Dollars ($229,945.00) 
shall, under the direction of the Executive Direc tor of Commerce, be 
allocated to support the Community Expansion of Nutrition Assis tance 
Program. 
 
SECTION 2.  From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma 
Department of Commerce in Enrol led Senate Bill No. 1125 of the 2nd 
Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of One Hundred 
Fifty Thousand Dollars ($150,000.00 ) shall, under the direction of 
the Executive Director of Commerce, be allocat ed to various Councils 
of Government to support substate planning . 
 
SECTION 3.  From the funds appropriated t o the Oklahoma 
Department of Commerce in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1125 of the 2nd 
Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of Thirty-six  ENR. H. B. NO. 2928 	Page 2 
Thousand Two Hundred Twenty-one Dollars ($36,221.00 ) shall, under 
the direction of the Executive Direc tor of Commerce, be allocated to 
support the functions of commun ity action agencies. 
 
SECTION 4.  From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma 
Department of Commerce in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1125 of the 2nd 
Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of One Hundred 
Eighty-three Thousand Eight Hundred Seventy-four Dollars 
($183,874.00) shall, under the direction of the Executive Director 
of Commerce, be allocated to community action agencies to support 
Head Start programs. 
 
SECTION 5.  From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma 
Department of Commerce in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1125 of the 2nd 
Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of Sixty-four 
Thousand Two Hundred Seventeen Dollars ($64,217.00 ) shall, under the 
direction of the Executive Direc tor of Commerce, be allocate d to the 
RX for Oklahoma Prescription Assistance program. 
 
SECTION 6.  From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma 
Department of Commerce in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1125 of the 2nd 
Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of Eight Hundred 
Fifty Thousand Dollars ($850,0 00.00) shall, under the direction of 
the Executive Director of Commerce, be allo cated to support Small 
Business Development Centers. 
 
SECTION 7.  From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma 
Department of Commerce in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1125 of the 2nd 
Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of Ten Million 
Dollars ($10,000,000.00) shall, under the direction of the Executive 
Director of Commerce, be allocated to help fund at Rogers State 
University a new Science, Technology, Engineering, and Mathematics 
(STEM) building. 
 
SECTION 8.  Appropriations made by this act, not including 
appropriations made for capital outlay purpos es, may be budgeted for 
the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025 (hereafter FY-25) or may be 
budgeted for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2026 (hereafter FY-26).  
Funds budgeted for FY-25 may be encumbered only through June 30, 
2025, and must be expended by No vember 15, 2025.  Any funds 
remaining after November 15, 2025, and not budgeted for FY-26, shall 
lapse to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal 
year.  Funds budgeted for FY-26 may be encumbered only through June 
30, 2026.  Any funds remaining after November 15, 2026, shall lapse 
to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal year.   ENR. H. B. NO. 2928 	Page 3 
These appropriations may not be budgeted in both fiscal years 
simultaneously.  Funds budgeted in FY-25, and not required to pay 
obligations for that fiscal year, may be budget ed for FY-26, after 
the agency to which the funds have been approp riated has prepared 
and submitted a budget work program revision removing the se funds 
from the FY-25 budget work program and after such revision has been 
approved by the Office of Management and Enterprise Services. 
 
SECTION 9.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2024. 
 
SECTION 10.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof th is act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its pas sage and approval. 
 
 
  ENR. H. B. NO. 2928 	Page 4 
Passed the House of Representat ives the 28th day of May, 2024. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the House 
 	of Representatives 
 
 
 
Passed the Senate the 30th day of May, 2024. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the Senate 
 
 
OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR 
Received by the Office of the Governor this ____________________ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _________________________________ 
Approved by the Governor of the State of Oklahoma this _____ ____ 
day of ______________ _____, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
 
 
 	_________________________________ 
 	Governor of the State of Oklahoma 
 
OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE 
Received by the Office of the Secretary of State this __________ 
day of ___________________, 20_______ , at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _________________________________