Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2928 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-An Act
2-ENROLLED HOUSE
1+
2+
3+ENGR. H. B. NO. 2928 Page 1 1
4+2
5+3
6+4
7+5
8+6
9+7
10+8
11+9
12+10
13+11
14+12
15+13
16+14
17+15
18+16
19+17
20+18
21+19
22+20
23+21
24+22
25+23
26+24
27+
28+ENGROSSED HOUSE
329 BILL NO. 2928 By: Wallace and Caldwell (Trey )
430 of the House
531
632 and
733
834 Hall and Rosino of the
935 Senate
1036
1137
1238
1339
1440 An Act relating to the Oklahoma Department of
1541 Commerce; requiring that portions of certain funds be
1642 utilized for certain purpo ses; providing budgeting
1743 and expenditure limitations and procedures; providing
1844 for lapse of funds under certain conditions;
1945 providing an effective date; and declaring an
2046 emergency.
2147
2248
2349
2450
25-SUBJECT: Oklahoma Department of Commerce
2651
2752 BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA:
28-
2953 SECTION 1. From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma
3054 Department of Commerce in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1125 of the 2nd
3155 Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of T wo Hundred
3256 Twenty-nine Thousand Nine Hundred Forty-five Dollars ($229,945.00)
3357 shall, under the direction of the Executive Direc tor of Commerce, be
3458 allocated to support the Community Expansion of Nutrition Assis tance
3559 Program.
36-
3760 SECTION 2. From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma
3861 Department of Commerce in Enrol led Senate Bill No. 1125 of the 2nd
3962 Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of One Hundred
4063 Fifty Thousand Dollars ($150,000.00 ) shall, under the direction of
64+
65+ENGR. H. B. NO. 2928 Page 2 1
66+2
67+3
68+4
69+5
70+6
71+7
72+8
73+9
74+10
75+11
76+12
77+13
78+14
79+15
80+16
81+17
82+18
83+19
84+20
85+21
86+22
87+23
88+24
89+
4190 the Executive Director of Commerce, be allocated to various Councils
4291 of Government to support substate planning.
43-
4492 SECTION 3. From the funds appropriated t o the Oklahoma
4593 Department of Commerce in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1125 of the 2nd
46-Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of Thirty-six ENR. H. B. NO. 2928 Page 2
94+Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of Thirty-six
4795 Thousand Two Hundred Twenty-one Dollars ($36,221.00) shall, under
4896 the direction of the Executive Direc tor of Commerce, be allocated to
4997 support the functions of commun ity action agencies.
50-
5198 SECTION 4. From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma
5299 Department of Commerce in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1125 of the 2nd
53100 Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of One Hundred
54101 Eighty-three Thousand Eight Hundred Seventy-four Dollars
55102 ($183,874.00) shall, under the direction of the Executive Direc tor
56103 of Commerce, be allocated to community action agencies to support
57104 Head Start programs.
58-
59105 SECTION 5. From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma
60106 Department of Commerce in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1125 of the 2nd
61107 Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of Sixty-four
62108 Thousand Two Hundred Seventeen Dollars ($64,217.00 ) shall, under the
63109 direction of the Executive Direc tor of Commerce, be allocate d to the
64110 RX for Oklahoma Prescription Assistance program.
65-
66111 SECTION 6. From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma
67112 Department of Commerce in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1125 of the 2nd
68113 Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of Eight Hundred
114+
115+ENGR. H. B. NO. 2928 Page 3 1
116+2
117+3
118+4
119+5
120+6
121+7
122+8
123+9
124+10
125+11
126+12
127+13
128+14
129+15
130+16
131+17
132+18
133+19
134+20
135+21
136+22
137+23
138+24
139+
69140 Fifty Thousand Dollars ($850,0 00.00) shall, under the direction of
70141 the Executive Director of Commerce, be allo cated to support Small
71142 Business Development Centers.
72-
73143 SECTION 7. From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma
74144 Department of Commerce in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1125 of the 2nd
75145 Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of Ten Million
76146 Dollars ($10,000,000.00) shall, under the direction of the Executive
77147 Director of Commerce, be allocated to help fund at Rogers State
78148 University a new Science, Technology, Engineering, and Mathematics
79149 (STEM) building.
80-
81150 SECTION 8. Appropriations made by this act, not including
82151 appropriations made for capital outlay purpos es, may be budgeted for
83152 the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025 (hereafter FY-25) or may be
84153 budgeted for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2026 (hereafter FY-26).
85154 Funds budgeted for FY-25 may be encumbered only through June 30,
86155 2025, and must be expended by No vember 15, 2025. Any funds
87156 remaining after November 15, 2025, and not budgeted for FY-26, shall
88157 lapse to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal
89158 year. Funds budgeted for FY-26 may be encumbered only through June
90159 30, 2026. Any funds remaining after November 15, 2026, shall lapse
91-to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal year. ENR. H. B. NO. 2928 Page 3
160+to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal year.
92161 These appropriations may not be budgeted in both fiscal years
93162 simultaneously. Funds budgeted in FY-25, and not required to pay
94163 obligations for that fiscal year, may be budget ed for FY-26, after
164+
165+ENGR. H. B. NO. 2928 Page 4 1
166+2
167+3
168+4
169+5
170+6
171+7
172+8
173+9
174+10
175+11
176+12
177+13
178+14
179+15
180+16
181+17
182+18
183+19
184+20
185+21
186+22
187+23
188+24
189+
95190 the agency to which the funds have been approp riated has prepared
96191 and submitted a budget work program revision removing the se funds
97192 from the FY-25 budget work program and after such revision has been
98193 approved by the Office of Management and Enterprise Services.
99-
100194 SECTION 9. This act shall become effective July 1, 2024.
101-
102195 SECTION 10. It being immediately necessary for the preservation
103196 of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby
104197 declared to exist, by reason whereof th is act shall take effect and
105198 be in full force from and after its passage and approval.
106-
107-
108- ENR. H. B. NO. 2928 Page 4
109199 Passed the House of Representat ives the 28th day of May, 2024.
110200
111201
112202
113203
114204 Presiding Officer of the House
115205 of Representatives
116206
117207
118208
119-Passed the Senate the 30th day of May, 2024.
209+Passed the Senate the ___ day of __________, 2024.
120210
121211
122212
123213
124214 Presiding Officer of the Senate
125215
126216
127-OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR
128-Received by the Office of the Governor this ____________________
129-day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M.
130-By: _________________________________
131-Approved by the Governor of the State of Oklahoma this _____ ____
132-day of ______________ _____, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M.
133-
134-
135- _________________________________
136- Governor of the State of Oklahoma
137-
138-OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE
139-Received by the Office of the Secretary of State this __________
140-day of ___________________, 20_______ , at _______ o'clock _______ M.
141-By: _________________________________
142-