Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2929 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-An Act
2-ENROLLED HOUSE
1+
2+
3+ENGR. H. B. NO. 2929 Page 1 1
4+2
5+3
6+4
7+5
8+6
9+7
10+8
11+9
12+10
13+11
14+12
15+13
16+14
17+15
18+16
19+17
20+18
21+19
22+20
23+21
24+22
25+23
26+24
27+
28+ENGROSSED HOUSE
329 BILL NO. 2929 By: Wallace and Caldwell (Trey)
430 of the House
531
632 and
733
834 Hall and Rosino of the
935 Senate
1036
1137
1238
1339
1440 An Act relating to the Oklahoma Department of Mental
1541 Health and Substance Abuse Services; requiring that
1642 portions of certain a ppropriated funds be used for
1743 certain purposes; providing budgeting and expenditure
1844 limitations and procedures; providing for lapse of
1945 funds under certain conditions; providing an
2046 effective date; and declaring an emergency .
2147
2248
2349
2450
25-SUBJECT: Oklahoma Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse
26-Services
2751
2852 BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA:
29-
3053 SECTION 1. From the funds appropriat ed to the Department of
3154 Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services in Enrolled Senate Bill
3255 No. 1125 of the 2nd Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legis lature, the
3356 sum of Three Million Nine Hundred Forty-eight Thousand Seven Hundred
3457 Sixty Dollars ($3,948,760.00) shall be used for annualization of the
3558 state portion of Medicaid rates.
36-
3759 SECTION 2. From the funds appropriated to the Department of
3860 Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services in Enrolled Senate Bill
3961 No. 1125 of the 2nd Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the
4062 sum of Eighteen Million Five Hundred Thousand Dollars
63+
64+ENGR. H. B. NO. 2929 Page 2 1
65+2
66+3
67+4
68+5
69+6
70+7
71+8
72+9
73+10
74+11
75+12
76+13
77+14
78+15
79+16
80+17
81+18
82+19
83+20
84+21
85+22
86+23
87+24
88+
4189 ($18,500,000.00) shall be used for the continuum of care for
4290 children in crisis.
43-
4491 SECTION 3. From the funds appropria ted to the Department of
4592 Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services in Enrolled Senate Bill
46-No. 1125 of the 2nd Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the ENR. H. B. NO. 2929 Page 2
93+No. 1125 of the 2nd Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the
4794 sum of Four Million One Hundred Thousand Dollars ($4,100,000.00)
4895 shall be reserved for implementation of potential consent de crees
4996 entered during the 2024 calendar year.
50-
5197 SECTION 4. From the funds appropriated to the Department of
5298 Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services in Enr olled Senate Bill
5399 No. 1125 of the 2nd Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the
54100 sum of Five Hundred Thousand Dollars ($500,000.00) shall b e used to
55101 maintain five pilot programs to provide offenders incarcerated in
56102 county jails in the State of O klahoma access to United States Food
57103 and Drug Administration -approved, evidence-based, medication-
58104 assisted treatment for opioid and alcohol dependence . Treatment may
59105 be administered while the inmate is confined in the county jail and
60106 when participating in outpatient care upon release. Funding may
61107 only be used for medical evaluations, the purchase o f United States
62108 Food and Drug Administration-approved medication to treat opioid or
63109 alcohol dependency, individual and group counseling services,
64110 cognitive behavioral therapies and necessary medical and behavioral
65111 health staff needed to maintain the progra m.
66112
113+ENGR. H. B. NO. 2929 Page 3 1
114+2
115+3
116+4
117+5
118+6
119+7
120+8
121+9
122+10
123+11
124+12
125+13
126+14
127+15
128+16
129+17
130+18
131+19
132+20
133+21
134+22
135+23
136+24
137+
67138 SECTION 5. The Commissioner of th e Department of Mental Health
68139 and Substance Abuse Services may request through the Director of the
69140 Office of Management and Enterprise Services the early transfer by
70141 the Oklahoma Tax Commission of tax collections to the General
71142 Revenue Fund for the purpose of early allocation to the Department 's
72143 disbursing funds to alleviate cash -flow problems.
73-
74144 SECTION 6. Appropriations made by this act, not including
75145 appropriations made for capital o utlay purposes, may be budgeted for
76146 the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025 (hereafter FY-25) or may be
77147 budgeted for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2026 (hereafter FY -26).
78148 Funds budgeted for FY-25 may be encumbered only through June 30,
79149 2025, and must be ex pended by November 15, 2025. Any funds
80150 remaining after November 15, 2025, and not budgeted for FY -26, shall
81151 lapse to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fisca l
82152 year. Funds budgeted for FY-26 may be encumbered only through June
83153 30, 2026. Any funds remaining after November 15, 2026, shall laps e
84154 to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal year.
85155 These appropriations may not be budgeted in both f iscal years
86156 simultaneously. Funds budgeted in FY -25, and not required to pay
87157 obligations for that fiscal year, may be budgeted for FY -26, after
88158 the agency to which the funds have been appropriated has prepared
89159 and submitted a budget work program revision removing these funds
90160 from the FY-25 budget work program and after such revision ha s been
91-approved by the Office of Management and Enterpr ise Services. ENR. H. B. NO. 2929 Page 3
161+approved by the Office of Management and Enterpr ise Services.
162+
163+ENGR. H. B. NO. 2929 Page 4 1
164+2
165+3
166+4
167+5
168+6
169+7
170+8
171+9
172+10
173+11
174+12
175+13
176+14
177+15
178+16
179+17
180+18
181+19
182+20
183+21
184+22
185+23
186+24
92187
93188 SECTION 7. This act shall become effective July 1, 2024.
94-
95189 SECTION 8. It being immediately necessary for the preservation
96190 of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby
97191 declared to exist, by reas on whereof this act shall take effect and
98192 be in full force from and after its passage and approval.
99-
100-
101- ENR. H. B. NO. 2929 Page 4
102193 Passed the House of Representatives the 28th day of May, 2024.
103194
104195
105196
106197
107198 Presiding Officer of the House
108199 of Representatives
109200
110201
111202
112-Passed the Senate the 30th day of May, 2024.
203+Passed the Senate the ___ day of __________, 2024.
113204
114205
115206
116207
117208 Presiding Officer of the Senate
118209
119210
120-OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR
121-Received by the Office of the Governor this ____________________
122-day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M.
123-By: _________________________________
124-Approved by the Governor of the State of O klahoma this _________
125-day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M.
126-
127-
128- _________________________________
129- Governor of the State of Oklahoma
130-
131-OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE
132-Received by the Office of the Secretary of State this ____ ______
133-day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M.
134-By: _________________________________
135- ENR. H. B. NO. 2929 Page 5
136-