Senate | 05/09/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Wolfley | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Hays | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 21 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lepak, Sims | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative McCall |