Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Conference granted, GCCA
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
HC's named: GCCA
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Authored by Senator Hamilton (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative West (Rick)
|
|
|