Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2982 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 12, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 17, 2024

Amended

Bill April 3, 2024
Bill March 1, 2024