Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Finance Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Wolfley
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Ranson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative McDugle
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Alonso-Sandoval
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Hefner
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Luttrell, Grego, Boles, Roberts, Sims
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate, Lepak, Bashore, Maynard, Stark
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative West (Josh)
|
|
|