SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2991 SFLR Page 1 (Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 SENATE FLOOR VERSION March 26, 2024 ENGROSSED HOUSE BILL NO. 2991 By: West (Josh) and Munson of the House and Gollihare of the Senate An Act relating to retirement; amending 11 O.S. 2021, Section 49-106, as amended by Section 1, Chapter 151, O.S.L. 2023 (11 O.S. Supp. 2023, Section 49 -106), which relates to the Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System; updating reference; directing that revisions be taken into account; and declaring an emergency. BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF TH E STATE OF OKLAHOMA: SECTION 1. AMENDATORY 11 O.S. 2021, Section 49 -106, as amended by Section 1, Chapter 151, O.S.L. 2023 (11 O.S. Supp. 2023, Section 49-106), is amended to read as follows: Section 49-106. A. Any firefighter w ho reaches the firefighter's normal retirement date shall be entitled, upon written request, to retire from such service and be paid from the Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System a monthly pension equal to the member's accrued retirement ben efit; provided, that the pension shall cease during any period of time the member may thereafter serve for compensation in any municipal fire department SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2991 SFLR Page 2 (Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 in the state. If such a member is reemployed by a participating municipality in a position which is no t covered by the System, retirement shall also include receipt by such member of in -service distributions from the System. B. With respect to distributions under the System made for calendar years beginning on or after January 1, 2005, the System shall apply the minimum distribution incidental benefit requirements, incidental benefit requirements, and minimum distribution requirements of Section 401(a)(9) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended, in accordance with the final regulations under Secti on 401(a)(9) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended, including Treasury Regulations Sections 1.401(a)(9)-1 through 1.401(a)(9) -9; provided, however, that for distributions required to be made after December 31 , 2019, for individuals who attain se venty and one-half (70 1/2) years of age after December 31, 2019, but before January 1, 2023, such distributions shall take into account that age 70 1/2 was stricken and age 72 was inserted in Section 401(a)(9)(B)(iv)(I), Section 401(a)(9)(C)(i)(I) and Sec tion 401(a)(9)(C)(ii)(I) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended, and, provided further, that for individuals who attain seventy -two (72) years of age after December 31, 2022, such distributions shall take into account that "age 72" was stricken and "the applicable age", as defined in Section 401(a)(9)(C)(v) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended, SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2991 SFLR Page 3 (Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 was inserted in Section 401(a)(9)(B)(iv)(I) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended (applicable to calendar year 2023) , Section 401(a)(9)(C)(i)(I) and Section 401(a)(9)(C)(ii)(I) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended, and that the further revision of Section 401(a)(9)(B)(iv) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended, effective for ca lendar years after 2023 with respect to certain distributions shall be taken into account, in all cases notwithstanding any provision of the System to the contrary. With respect to distributions under the System made for calendar years beginning on or after January 1, 2001, through December 31, 2004, the System shall apply the minimum distribution requirements and incidental benefit requirements of Section 401(a)(9) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended, in accordance with the regulations under Section 401(a)(9) of the Internal Rev enue Code of 1986, as amended, which were proposed in January 2001, notwithstanding any provision of the System to the contrary. Effective July 1, 1989, notwithstanding any other provision contained herein to the contrary, in no event shall commencement o f distribution of the accrued retirement benefit of a member be delayed beyond April 1 of the calendar year following the later of: 1. The calendar year in which the member reaches seventy and one-half (70 1/2) years o f age for a member who attains age se venty and one-half (70 1/2) before January 1, 2020, or effective for distributions required to be made after December 31, 2019, but SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2991 SFLR Page 4 (Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 before January 1, 2023, the calendar year in which the member reaches seventy-two (72) years of age for an individual who at tains age seventy and one-half (70 1/2) after December 31, 2019, or effective for distributions required to be made after December 31, 2022, the calendar year in which the member reaches seventy -three (73) years of age for an individual who attains age sev enty-two (72) after December 31, 2022, or "the applicable age", as defined in Section 401(a)(9)(C)(v) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended, if later; or 2. The actual retirement date of the member. Effective September 8, 2009, notwithstanding anything to the contrary of the System, the System, which is a governmental plan (within the meaning of Section 414(d) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended) is treated as having complied with Section 401(a)(9) of the Internal Revenue Code of 19 86, as amended, for all years to which Section 401(a)(9) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended, applies to the System if the System complies with a reasonable and good -faith interpretation of Section 401(a)(9) of the Internal Revenue Code of 198 6, as amended. C. Any member or beneficiary eligible to receive a monthly benefit from the System may make an election to waive all or a portion of monthly benefits. D. If the requirements of Section 49 -106.5 of this title are satisfied, a member who, by reason of attainment of normal SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2991 SFLR Page 5 (Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 retirement date or age, is separated from service as a public safety officer with the member 's participating municipality, may elect to have payment made directly to the provider for qualified health insurance premiums by de duction from his or her monthly pension payment, after December 31, 2006, in accordance with Section 402(l) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended. For distributions made after December 29, 2022, the election provided for under Section 402(l) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended, may be made whether payment of the premiums is made directly to the provider of the accident or health plan or qualified long -term care insurance contract by deduction from a distribution from the System or is made to the member. SECTION 2. It being immediately necessary for the preservation of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall tak e effect and be in full force from an d after its passage and approval. COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON RETIREMENT AND INSURANCE March 26, 2024 - DO PASS