3 | 34 | | BILL NO. 2991 By: West (Josh) and Munson of |
---|
4 | 35 | | the House |
---|
5 | 36 | | |
---|
6 | 37 | | and |
---|
7 | 38 | | |
---|
8 | 39 | | Gollihare of the Senate |
---|
9 | 40 | | |
---|
10 | 41 | | |
---|
11 | 42 | | |
---|
12 | 43 | | |
---|
13 | 44 | | |
---|
14 | 45 | | An Act relating to retirement; amending 11 O.S. 2021, |
---|
15 | 46 | | Section 49-106, as amended by Section 1, Chapter 151, |
---|
16 | 47 | | O.S.L. 2023 (11 O.S. Supp. 2023, Section 49 -106), |
---|
17 | 48 | | which relates to the Oklahoma Firefighters Pension |
---|
18 | 49 | | and Retirement System; updating reference; directing |
---|
19 | 50 | | that revisions be taken into account; and declaring |
---|
20 | 51 | | an emergency. |
---|
21 | 52 | | |
---|
22 | 53 | | |
---|
23 | 54 | | |
---|
33 | 59 | | Section 49-106. A. Any firefighter w ho reaches the |
---|
34 | 60 | | firefighter's normal retirement date shall be entitled, upon written |
---|
35 | 61 | | request, to retire from such service and be paid from the Oklahoma |
---|
36 | 62 | | Firefighters Pension and Retirement System a monthly pension equal |
---|
37 | 63 | | to the member's accrued retirement ben efit; provided, that the |
---|
38 | 64 | | pension shall cease during any period of time the member may |
---|
39 | 65 | | thereafter serve for compensation in any municipal fire department |
---|
47 | 99 | | shall apply the minimum distribution incidental benefit |
---|
48 | 100 | | requirements, incidental benefit requirements, and minimum |
---|
49 | 101 | | distribution requirements of Section 401(a)(9) of the Internal |
---|
50 | 102 | | Revenue Code of 1986, as amended, in accordance with the final |
---|
51 | 103 | | regulations under Secti on 401(a)(9) of the Internal Revenue Code of |
---|
52 | 104 | | 1986, as amended, including Treasury Regulations Sections |
---|
53 | 105 | | 1.401(a)(9)-1 through 1.401(a)(9) -9; provided, however, that for |
---|
54 | 106 | | distributions required to be made after December 31 , 2019, for |
---|
55 | 107 | | individuals who attain se venty and one-half (70 1/2) years of age |
---|
56 | 108 | | after December 31, 2019, but before January 1, 2023, such |
---|
57 | 109 | | distributions shall take into account that age 70 1/2 was stricken |
---|
58 | 110 | | and age 72 was inserted in Section 401(a)(9)(B)(iv)(I), Section |
---|
59 | 111 | | 401(a)(9)(C)(i)(I) and Sec tion 401(a)(9)(C)(ii)(I) of the Internal |
---|
60 | 112 | | Revenue Code of 1986, as amended, and, provided further, that for |
---|
61 | 113 | | individuals who attain seventy -two (72) years of age after December |
---|
62 | 114 | | 31, 2022, such distributions shall take into account that "age 72" |
---|
63 | 115 | | was stricken and "the applicable age", as defined in Section |
---|
64 | 116 | | 401(a)(9)(C)(v) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended, |
---|
65 | 144 | | was inserted in Section 401(a)(9)(B)(iv)(I) of the Internal Revenue |
---|
66 | 145 | | Code of 1986, as amended (applicable to calendar year 2023) , Section |
---|
67 | 146 | | 401(a)(9)(C)(i)(I) and Section 401(a)(9)(C)(ii)(I) of the Internal |
---|
68 | 147 | | Revenue Code of 1986, as amended, and that the further revision of |
---|
69 | 148 | | Section 401(a)(9)(B)(iv) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as |
---|
70 | 149 | | amended, effective for ca lendar years after 2023 with respect to |
---|
71 | 150 | | certain distributions shall be taken into account, in all cases |
---|
72 | 151 | | notwithstanding any provision of the System to the contrary. With |
---|
73 | 152 | | respect to distributions under the System made for calendar years |
---|
74 | 153 | | beginning on or after January 1, 2001, through December 31, 2004, |
---|
75 | 154 | | the System shall apply the minimum distribution requirements and |
---|
76 | 155 | | incidental benefit requirements of Section 401(a)(9) of the Internal |
---|
77 | 156 | | Revenue Code of 1986, as amended, in accordance with the regulations |
---|
78 | 157 | | under Section 401(a)(9) of the Internal Rev enue Code of 1986, as |
---|
79 | 158 | | amended, which were proposed in January 2001, notwithstanding any |
---|
80 | 159 | | provision of the System to the contrary. Effective July 1, 1989, |
---|
81 | 160 | | notwithstanding any other provision contained herein to the |
---|
82 | 161 | | contrary, in no event shall commencement o f distribution of the |
---|
83 | 162 | | accrued retirement benefit of a member be delayed beyond April 1 of |
---|
84 | 163 | | the calendar year following the later of: |
---|
92 | 197 | | age seventy and one-half (70 1/2) after December 31, 2019, or |
---|
93 | 198 | | effective for distributions required to be made after December 31, |
---|
94 | 199 | | 2022, the calendar year in which the member reaches seventy -three |
---|
95 | 200 | | (73) years of age for an individual who attains age sev enty-two (72) |
---|
96 | 201 | | after December 31, 2022, or "the applicable age", as defined in |
---|
97 | 202 | | Section 401(a)(9)(C)(v) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as |
---|
98 | 203 | | amended, if later; or |
---|
102 | 205 | | Effective September 8, 2009, notwithstanding anything to the |
---|
103 | 206 | | contrary of the System, the System, which is a governmental plan |
---|
104 | 207 | | (within the meaning of Section 414(d) of the Internal Revenue Code |
---|
105 | 208 | | of 1986, as amended) is treated as having complied with Section |
---|
106 | 209 | | 401(a)(9) of the Internal Revenue Code of 19 86, as amended, for all |
---|
107 | 210 | | years to which Section 401(a)(9) of the Internal Revenue Code of |
---|
108 | 211 | | 1986, as amended, applies to the System if the System complies with |
---|
109 | 212 | | a reasonable and good -faith interpretation of Section 401(a)(9) of |
---|
110 | 213 | | the Internal Revenue Code of 198 6, as amended. |
---|
118 | 246 | | retirement date or age, is separated from service as a public safety |
---|
119 | 247 | | officer with the member 's participating municipality, may elect to |
---|
120 | 248 | | have payment made directly to the provider for qualified health |
---|
121 | 249 | | insurance premiums by de duction from his or her monthly pension |
---|
122 | 250 | | payment, after December 31, 2006, in accordance with Section 402(l) |
---|
123 | 251 | | of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended. For distributions |
---|
124 | 252 | | made after December 29, 2022, the election provided for under |
---|
125 | 253 | | Section 402(l) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended, may |
---|
126 | 254 | | be made whether payment of the premiums is made directly to the |
---|
127 | 255 | | provider of the accident or health plan or qualified long -term care |
---|
128 | 256 | | insurance contract by deduction from a distribution from the System |
---|
129 | 257 | | or is made to the member. |
---|
135 | | - | ENR. H. B. NO. 2991 Page 4 |
---|
136 | | - | Passed the House of Representatives the 6th day of March, 2024. |
---|
137 | | - | |
---|
138 | | - | |
---|
139 | | - | |
---|
140 | | - | |
---|
141 | | - | Presiding Officer of the House |
---|
142 | | - | of Representatives |
---|
143 | | - | |
---|
144 | | - | |
---|
145 | | - | |
---|
146 | | - | Passed the Senate the 22nd day of April, 2024. |
---|
147 | | - | |
---|
148 | | - | |
---|
149 | | - | |
---|
150 | | - | |
---|
151 | | - | Presiding Officer of the Senate |
---|
152 | | - | |
---|
153 | | - | |
---|
154 | | - | OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR |
---|
155 | | - | Received by the Office of the Governor this ____________________ |
---|
156 | | - | day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. |
---|
157 | | - | By: _________________________________ |
---|
158 | | - | Approved by the Governor of the State of Oklahoma this _____ ____ |
---|
159 | | - | day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. |
---|
160 | | - | |
---|
161 | | - | |
---|
162 | | - | _________________________________ |
---|
163 | | - | Governor of the State of Oklahoma |
---|
164 | | - | |
---|
165 | | - | OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE |
---|
166 | | - | Received by the Office of the Secretary of State this __________ |
---|
167 | | - | day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. |
---|
168 | | - | By: _________________________________ |
---|
| 262 | + | COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON RETIREMENT AND INSURANCE |
---|
| 263 | + | March 26, 2024 - DO PASS |
---|