Senate | 03/26/2024 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Randleman | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Lepak |