House
|
05/13/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/13/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Hicks
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Remove as author Senator Hicks; authored by Senator Daniels
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Pittman
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Authored by Senator Hicks (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) McEntire
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Hasenbeck
|
|
|