Senate | 03/27/2024 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 8 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Amended | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Authored by Senator Gollihare (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Worthen |