Senate | 03/27/2024 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 15 | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Amended | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Authored by Senator Stephens (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Referred to Public Health | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Randleman |