Senate | 04/08/2024 | Coauthored by Senator Jett | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Finance | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Caldwell (Chad) | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Maynard |