Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Amended | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Authored by Senator Gollihare (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Stinson |