Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Amended | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Boles |