Senate | 03/27/2024 | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Amended | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Authored by Senator Stewart (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Steagall |