Senate | 03/27/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Dollens | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 10 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Authored by Senator Rogers (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dollens | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Withdrawn from Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Tedford |