LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Oklahoma OK
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB3182
Draft Versions
OK
Oklahoma House Bill HB3182
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session
Oklahoma House Bill HB3182
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 17, 2024
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
March 11, 2024
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
April 23, 2024
Compare
Amended
Bill
April 2, 2024
Compare
Bill
February 7, 2024
Compare