Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3191 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 18, 2024

Amended

Bill April 15, 2024
Bill February 19, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 14, 2024