House
|
04/30/2024
|
Vetoed 04/30/2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Amendment restored bill to engrossed version
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Energy and Telecommunications committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Energy and Telecommunications
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 20
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Considered
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Laid over
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Authored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Natural Resources Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Newton
|
|
|