Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Finance Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Title stricken | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Authored by Senator Jech (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Newton, McDugle | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Remove Representative Newton as principal House author and substitute with Representative Hilbert | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Newton |