Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 16 | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hardin | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative West (Kevin) |