Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3266 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/17/2024

                             
RBH No. 8458 
 
Req. No. 8458 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
2nd Session of the 59th Legislature (2024) 
 
HOUSE BILL 3266 	By: Wolfley 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to retirement; authorizing retirement 
benefit increase for certain retire d members of the 
Oklahoma Public Employees Retirement System; 
providing for codification; and providing an 
effective date. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Secti on 930.12 of Title 74, unless there 
is created a duplication in numbering, reads a s follows: 
Any member receiving benefits from the Oklahoma Public Employees 
Retirement System as of June 30, 2023, who continues to receive 
benefits on or after July 1, 2023, shall receive: 
1.  An increase in benefits of eight percent (8%) if the member 
has a gross retirement benefit of less than Ninety Thousand Dollars 
($90,000.00); and 
2.  An increase of benefits in an amount necessary for the 
member's gross retirement benef it to equal Ninety-seven Thousand Two   
RBH No. 8458 
 
Req. No. 8458 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Hundred Dollars ($97,200.00) if the member has a gross retirement 
benefit of at least Ninety Thousand Dollars ($90,000.00) but less 
than Ninety-seven Thousand One Hundred Ninety-nine Dollars and 
ninety-nine cents ($97,199.99). 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2024. 
 
59-2-8458 CMA 12/20/23  
 
THOMAS E. CUMMINS  CONSULTING ACTUARY, INC. 
2512 E. 71
st 
Street ,  Suite D ∙  Tulsa, Oklahoma 74136                           
(918) 492-9658  ∙ (918) 492- 9659 
 
 
 
 
January 8, 2024 
 
 
 
Representative Wolfley 
Room 346.1  
 
 
Re: RBH No. 8458 
 
 
RBH No. 8458 is an OPERS cost of living bill . If the current gross 
payment is less than $90,000 the increase is 8%. If the gross 
payment is less than $92,000 but greater than $90,000 t he increase 
is the amount necessary for the gross benefit to equal $92,000.  
 
RBH No. 8458 is a fiscal bill as defined by OPLAAA.  
 
 
I am a member of the American Academy of Actuaries and meet the 
Qualification Standards of the American Academy of Actuaries to 
render the actuarial opinion herein. 
 
 
Thomas E. Cummins 
 
Thomas E. Cummins, MAAA