Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Finance Committee | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Coauthored by Senator Jett | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 55 Nays: 41 | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Maynard | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Staires |