House
|
05/16/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/16/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Withdrawn from Health and Human Services committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Finance Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Munson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Deck
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Authored by Senator Thompson (Kristen) (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative McEntire
|
|
|