Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3369 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 13, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 29, 2024

Amended

Bill April 3, 2024
Bill February 16, 2024