Senate | 04/24/2024 | Remove as author Senator Thompson (Kristen); authored by Senator Haste | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Reported Do Pass Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation Committee then to Finance Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Authored by Senator Thompson (Kristen) (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Lowe (Dick) |