Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Staires
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation Committee then to Finance Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Alonso-Sandoval
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 28
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Authored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Menz
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Archer
|
|
|