House
|
04/29/2024
|
Approved by Governor 04/29/2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Amendment restored bill to engrossed version
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Authored by Senator Jech (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Moore
|
|
|