House
|
05/01/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/01/2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 20
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Moore
|
|
|