House
|
05/15/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/15/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Authored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to Judiciary - Civil
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Moore
|
|
|