Senate | 03/25/2024 | Referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended Agriculture and Rural Affairs committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee then to Finance Committee | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 1 | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Amended | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Title stricken | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Authored by Senator Rogers (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Archer | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Sneed |