Senate | 04/09/2024 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | CR; Do Pass Government Modernization and Technology Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization and Technology | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Sneed |